WA SB6541 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the use of workforce investment funds for layoff aversion.
Title
Regarding the use of workforce investment funds for layoff aversion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2012-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-01 | EDTI - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-02-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-30 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-30 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6541&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6541.pdf |