WA SB6541 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the establishment of performance management systems at state hospitals.
Title
Requiring the establishment of performance management systems at state hospitals.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] |
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | ACRE - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Accountability & Reform at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Accountability & Reform at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Accountability & Reform. |