WA SB6547 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Completing the transfer of the early support for infants and toddlers program from the office of the superintendent of public instruction to the department of children, youth, and families.
Title
Completing the transfer of the early support for infants and toddlers program from the office of the superintendent of public instruction to the department of children, youth, and families.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2787 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Effective date 9/1/2020.