WA SB6552 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Improving student success by increasing instructional hour and graduation requirements.
Title
Improving student success by increasing instructional hour and graduation requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014*. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chapter 217, 2014 Laws PV. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2014-03-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted as amended. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-03-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-03-01 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-03-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2014-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | ED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-13 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 5:30 PM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |