WA SB6560 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Studying the feasibility of postsecondary student housing within retirement facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Studying the feasibility of postsecondary student housing within retirement facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-10SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-10SenateWM - Majority; without recommendation.
2020-02-10SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-06SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-06SenateHEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-22SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback