WA SB6570 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning law enforcement officer mental health and wellness.
Title
Concerning law enforcement officer mental health and wellness.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 327, 2020 Laws PV. |
2020-04-01 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-27 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | BH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |