WA SB6573 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the effective date of modifications to the aged, blind, and disabled and the housing and essential needs programs.
Title
Changing the effective date of modifications to the aged, blind, and disabled and the housing and essential needs programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chapter 218, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |