WA SB6574 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the respective administrative powers, duties, and responsibilities of the growth management hearings board and the environmental land use and hearings office.
Title
Clarifying the respective administrative powers, duties, and responsibilities of the growth management hearings board and the environmental land use and hearings office.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 214, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |