WA SB6578 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Designating pumped storage projects located in a county bordering the Columbia river utilizing statutorily authorized water rights to be projects of statewide significance.
Title
Designating pumped storage projects located in a county bordering the Columbia river utilizing statutorily authorized water rights to be projects of statewide significance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2819 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.