WA SB6582 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the number of fire protection district commissioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the number of fire protection district commissioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-28HouseLG - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2020-02-19SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-18SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-28SenateLGOV - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-28SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to Local Government.

Same As/Similar To

HB2908 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - First reading, referred to Local Government.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback