WA SB6591 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a work group to address mental health advance directives.
Title
Establishing a work group to address mental health advance directives.
Sponsors
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | BH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |