WA SB6601 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governor to enter into compacts with Indian tribes addressing certain state retail sales tax, certain state use tax, and certain state business and occupation tax revenues, as specified in a memorandum of understanding entered into by the state, Tulalip tribes, and Snohomish county, in January 2020, and including other terms necessary for the department of revenue to administer any such compact.
Title
Authorizing the governor to enter into compacts with Indian tribes addressing certain state retail sales tax, certain state use tax, and certain state business and occupation tax revenues, as specified in a memorandum of understanding entered into by the state, Tulalip tribes, and Snohomish county, in January 2020, and including other terms necessary for the department of revenue to administer any such compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2803 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.