WA SB6605 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Licensing security guards.
Title
Licensing security guards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-29 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-26 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |