WA SB6606 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning regional transit authorities.
Title
Concerning regional transit authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |