WA SB6607 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning premiums for individual health coverage.
Title
Concerning premiums for individual health coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-05 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |