WA SB6607 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Instituting policies to reduce the central service costs of state government.
Title
Instituting policies to reduce the central service costs of state government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-03-08 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2012-03-07 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-03-06 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2012-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2012-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-05 | Floor amendment | |
2012-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-27 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2012-02-27 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-27 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-02-23 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |