WA SB6607 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permitting students to wear traditional tribal regalia and objects of cultural significance at graduation ceremonies and related events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting students to wear traditional tribal regalia and objects of cultural significance at graduation ceremonies and related events.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2020-02-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-07SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-07SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-07SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Same As/Similar To

HB2551 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Effective date 3/18/2020.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback