WA SB6622 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a comprehensive, statewide photovoltaic module recovery, reuse, recycling, and end-of-life program.
Title
Establishing a comprehensive, statewide photovoltaic module recovery, reuse, recycling, and end-of-life program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |