WA SB6631 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sales and use tax for affordable and supportive housing.
Title
Concerning the sales and use tax for affordable and supportive housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | HSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2797 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.