WA SB6632 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing additional funding for the business licensing service program administered by the department of revenue.
Title
Providing additional funding for the business licensing service program administered by the department of revenue.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 164, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2840 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.