WA SB6637 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the small business credit for the business and occupation tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the small business credit for the business and occupation tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-15 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2010-01-28 Referred to Ways & Means.
2010-01-28 And refer to Ways & Means.
2010-01-28 EDTI - Majority; do pass.
2010-01-27 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM.
2010-01-25 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM.
2010-01-19 First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation.

Same As/Similar To

HB3101 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback