WA SB6645 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing a city, town, code city, or county to request mediation in the event of a conflict with another city, town, code city, or county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing a city, town, code city, or county to request mediation in the event of a conflict with another city, town, code city, or county.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-02-25SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2016-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2016-02-05SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2016-02-05SenateMinority; do not pass.
2016-02-05SenateGOS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2016-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 5:45 PM.
2016-02-04SenateFirst reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback