WA SB6671 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the department of revenue to collect tribal timber harvest excise tax under a timber harvest excise tax agreement authorized in chapter 43.06 RCW.
Title
Authorizing the department of revenue to collect tribal timber harvest excise tax under a timber harvest excise tax agreement authorized in chapter 43.06 RCW.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6671&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6671.pdf |