WA SB6676 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning reimbursement for primary care services for medicaid beneficiaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning reimbursement for primary care services for medicaid beneficiaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2020-02-19HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.
2020-02-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-10SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-10SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-10SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-06SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback