WA SB6690 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning aerospace business and occupation taxes and world trade organization compliance.
Title
Concerning aerospace business and occupation taxes and world trade organization compliance.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 3/25/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 165, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. |
2020-03-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-03-11 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2945 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.