WA SJM8019 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting Congress to address volcano early warning and monitoring.
Title
Requesting Congress to address volcano early warning and monitoring.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 11:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |