WA SJR8209 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution creating the Washington state infrastructure bank.
Title
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution creating the Washington state infrastructure bank.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | FIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |