WA SJR8211 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution concerning revenues from certain premiums, contributions, and other charges imposed on wages.
Title
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution concerning revenues from certain premiums, contributions, and other charges imposed on wages.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |