WA SJR8212 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Proposing an amendment to the Constitution concerning the investment of funds to provide for long-term care services and supports. )
Title
(REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Proposing an amendment to the Constitution concerning the investment of funds to provide for long-term care services and supports. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, adopted; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |