WI AB103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: eliminating administrative rule limitation on recovery of birth costs. (FE)
Title
Eliminating administrative rule limitation on recovery of birth costs. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Brooks and Doyle |
2019-06-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2019-03-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab103 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB103.pdf |