WI AB112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-21-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-21-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 985.01 (3r) and 985.12 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: eligibility of Washington Island Observer newspaper to receive compensation for publication of legal notices and the content of affidavits of printing filed as evidence of publication.
Title
Eligibility of Washington Island Observer newspaper to receive compensation for publication of legal notices and the content of affidavits of printing filed as evidence of publication.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | House | Published 11-21-2019 |
2019-11-20 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-20-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 32 |
2019-11-14 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-14-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-11-13 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-13-2019 |
2019-11-13 | House | LRB correction |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-10-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-10 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-10 | House | Read a second time |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-09-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2019-09-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2019-07-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2019-04-22 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2019-04-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-27 | House | Senator Nass added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-22 | House | Introduced |