WI AB113 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 283.84 (1m) (d); and to create 16.9685, 283.84 (1) (f), 283.84 (1) (g), 283.84 (1m) (e) and 283.84 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: buying and selling water pollution credits through a central clearinghouse. (FE)
Title
Buying and selling water pollution credits through a central clearinghouse. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-10-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2019-06-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2019-06-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2019-04-04 | House | Representative Felzkowski withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-04-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-03-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab113 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB113.pdf |