WI AB115 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 121.02 (1) (f); and to create 121.02 (1) (f) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: an emergency exception for high performing school districts to the number of hours of direct pupil instruction requirement. (FE)
Title
An emergency exception for high performing school districts to the number of hours of direct pupil instruction requirement. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Rep. Terry Katsma [R] | Rep. Patrick Snyder [R] | Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] |
Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Sen. Rob Hutton [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Chris Kapenga [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab115 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB115.pdf |