WI AB117 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 101.65 (3); and to create 101.65 (3) (a) and (b) of the statutes; Relating to: submission of building permit applications for one-family and two-family dwellings.
Title
Submission of building permit applications for one-family and two-family dwellings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Published 11-22-2019 |
2019-11-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-21-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 38 |
2019-11-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-15-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-10-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-11-2019 |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-04-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |