WI AB119 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on January 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - Published 1-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on January 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - Published 1-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 16.308 (3m); and to create 16.308 (3m) (b) to (i) and 16.308 (3s) of the statutes; Relating to: grants to homeless shelters, modifying administrative rules promulgated by the Department of Administration, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to homeless shelters, modifying administrative rules promulgated by the Department of Administration, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Refused to reject Senate Amendment 1 (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Refused to reject Senate Amendment 1 (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Published 1-29-2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 1-28-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 76 |
2020-01-24 | House | Presented to the Governor on 1-24-2020 |
2020-01-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-24-2020 |
2020-01-24 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 3) |
2020-01-24 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2020-01-21 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Senate Amendment 1 concurred in |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 17, Noes 14 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Refused to reject Senate Amendment 1, Ayes 14, Noes 19 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Nass |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Point of order that motion to withdraw a bill from committee is only in order under the 13th order of business well taken |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 adopted |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Steineke |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2019-06-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2019-06-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2019-06-12 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2019-06-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Committee on Public Benefit Reform |
2019-06-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Steineke |
2019-05-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steineke |
2019-05-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-26 | House | Representative Novak added as a coauthor |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefit Reform |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |