WI AB122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 106.11 and 106.13 (2); and to create 106.115 and 106.120 of the statutes; Relating to: employment and training activities for homeless populations, the Council on Workforce Investment, and local workforce development boards.
Title
Employment and training activities for homeless populations, the Council on Workforce Investment, and local workforce development boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2019-06-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-04-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-23 | House | LRB correction |
2019-04-03 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2019-03-26 | House | Representative Novak added as a coauthor |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab122 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB122.pdf |