WI AB124 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 16.303 (1); to amend 16.303 (2) (intro.), 16.303 (3) (a), 16.303 (3) (b) and 16.304 (1) (a); and to create 16.303 (1g) and 16.303 (1r) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: grants to defray housing costs and for diversion programming and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to defray housing costs and for diversion programming and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2019-06-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2019-06-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-31 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Plumer |
2019-05-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-26 | House | Representative Novak added as a coauthor |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefit Reform |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab124 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB124.pdf |