WI AB134 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 23.0917 (5g) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: amounts obligated under the Warren Knowles-Gaylord Nelson Stewardship 2000 Program for water infrastructure projects in state parks and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Amounts obligated under the Warren Knowles-Gaylord Nelson Stewardship 2000 Program for water infrastructure projects in state parks and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2019-10-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-07-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Summerfield |
2019-05-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-27 | House | Senator Miller added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab134 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB134.pdf |