WI AB149 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.255 (2) (fh) and 115.413; to amend 119.04 (1); and to create 20.255 (2) (fh) and 115.413 of the statutes; Relating to: professional development training in character education for teachers, pupil service professionals, principals, and school district administrators, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Professional development training in character education for teachers, pupil service professionals, principals, and school district administrators, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rodriguez |
2019-10-04 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2019-08-14 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2019-04-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab149 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB149.pdf |