WI AB15 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.0114 (1) (b); to amend 800.035 (5) (a); and to create 66.0114 (1) (b) 2., 66.0114 (1) (b) 3., 345.26 (1) (b) 3., 800.035 (5) (am) and 967.055 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring persons accused of violating traffic laws and ordinances related to driving while intoxicated to appear in person in court. (FE)
Title
Requiring persons accused of violating traffic laws and ordinances related to driving while intoxicated to appear in person in court. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Vote by which Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 tabled reconsidered |
2019-06-20 | House | Motion to reconsider vote by which Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 tabled offered by Representative Steineke |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 34 |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-19 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a coauthor |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2019-06-12 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2019-06-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2019-05-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Crowley, Spreitzer and Emerson |
2019-04-30 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ott |
2019-04-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-27 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced |