WI AB157 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 40.22 (1), 40.22 (2m) (intro.), 40.22 (2r) (intro.) and 40.22 (3) (intro.); and to create 40.26 (6) (intro.), (a), (b) and (c) of the statutes; Relating to: law enforcement and fire fighter annuitants in the Wisconsin Retirement System who are rehired by a participating employer and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Law enforcement and fire fighter annuitants in the Wisconsin Retirement System who are rehired by a participating employer and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-02 | House | Representative Krug added as a coauthor |
2019-07-16 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2019-05-17 | House | Senator Kooyenga added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-09 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2019-04-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-11 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab157 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB157.pdf |