WI AB16 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.65 (2) (am) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: committing a fifth or sixth offense related to operating a vehicle while intoxicated and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Committing a fifth or sixth offense related to operating a vehicle while intoxicated and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 5 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-09-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-05 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a coauthor |
2019-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Emerson and Crowley |
2019-05-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Crowley, Spreitzer and Emerson |
2019-04-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-27 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab16 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB16.pdf |