WI AB165 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 348.15 (3) (bg) of the statutes; Relating to: weight limits for certain vehicles transporting maple sap or syrup. (FE)
Title
Weight limits for certain vehicles transporting maple sap or syrup. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2019-10-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2019-04-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab165 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB165.pdf |