WI AB17 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-21-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-21-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 940.09 (1c) (a) and 940.09 (1c) (b); and to create 940.09 (1c) (a) 2. and 940.09 (1c) (b) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: mandatory period of confinement for homicide by intoxicated use of a vehicle and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Mandatory period of confinement for homicide by intoxicated use of a vehicle and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | House | Published 11-21-2019 |
2019-11-20 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-20-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 31 |
2019-11-14 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-14-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-11-13 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-13-2019 |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2019-06-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2019-06-05 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a coauthor |
2019-05-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Ott |
2019-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Crowley, Spreitzer and Emerson |
2019-04-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-27 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced |