WI AB170 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 86.191 (6) (a); and to create 86.191 (6) (a) 2. and 86.191 (6) (d) 6. of the statutes; Relating to: advertising on bus shelters located on state trunk highways.
Title
Advertising on bus shelters located on state trunk highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | House | Published 8-3-2017 |
2017-08-02 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 8-2-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 37 |
2017-08-01 | House | Presented to the Governor on 8-1-2017 |
2017-06-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-23-2017 |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-05-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-10 | House | Representatives Kolste and Meyers added as coauthors |
2017-05-10 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-10 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-10 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-05-10 | House | Read a second time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-03 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2017-05-03 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2017-04-25 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hutton |
2017-03-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced |