WI AB170 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 120.11 (2); and to create 120.11 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the method for providing notice of a special meeting of a school board. (FE)
Title
The method for providing notice of a special meeting of a school board. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-06-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab170 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB170.pdf |