WI AB178 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.60 (1) (ag), 36.60 (3) (a), 36.60 (3) (am), 36.60 (5) (b) (intro.), 36.61 (1) (am) and 36.61 (5) (b) (intro.); and to create 36.60 (1) (ah), 36.60 (5) (bm) and 36.61 (5) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: eligibility for physician, dentist, and health care provider educational loan assistance programs. (FE)
Title
Eligibility for physician, dentist, and health care provider educational loan assistance programs. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-12 | House | Representative Bowen withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-11-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-07 | House | Representative C. Taylor withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 13, Noes 1 |
2019-11-05 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 10, Noes 4 |
2019-11-05 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-11-04 | House | Representative Riemer withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-10-31 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Felzkowski |
2019-10-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Felzkowski |
2019-10-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Wichgers |
2019-08-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Felzkowski, Kolste and Riemer |
2019-07-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab178 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB178.pdf |