WI AB183 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-9)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-9)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 961.55 (8); to amend 94.67 (2) and 97.02; and to create 20.115 (7) (gc), 94.55, 348.27 (18) (a) 1. e., 961.32 (3), 961.55 (8) (b) and 961.55 (9) of the statutes; Relating to: growing and processing industrial hemp, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Growing and processing industrial hemp, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-09 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-11-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-07 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a coauthor |
2017-11-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kremer |
2017-10-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-18 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2017-10-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Considine |
2017-10-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Considine |
2017-10-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Considine |
2017-05-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab183 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB183.pdf |