WI AB184 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 86.303 (5) (f) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: local reporting requirements related to general transportation aids.
Title
Local reporting requirements related to general transportation aids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-06-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab184 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB184.pdf |