WI AB186 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 97.30 (1) (c); and to create 66.0416 and 97.29 (1) (h) 12m. of the statutes; Relating to: allowing minors to operate temporary stands without a permit or license. (FE)
Title
Allowing minors to operate temporary stands without a permit or license. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-10-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-10-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-09-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-19 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2019-05-17 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2019-05-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-01 | House | Representative Schraa added as a coauthor |
2019-04-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Horlacher and Sargent |
2019-04-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab186 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB186.pdf |